NY S05602 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - PRINT NUMBER 5602A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - PRINT NUMBER 5602A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes sharing, making available, selling, exchanging, giving or disposing of a community gun as an element of certain criminal acts including criminal facilitation and criminal sale of a firearm.
Title
Includes sharing, making available, selling, exchanging, giving or disposing of a community gun as an element of certain criminal acts including criminal facilitation and criminal sale of a firearm.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5602A |
2014-02-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2013-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A03255 (Same As) 2014-04-07 - print number 3255a