NY S05590 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.344
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.344
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Waterloo, county of Seneca to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parkland.
Title
Authorizes the town of Waterloo, county of Seneca to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parkland.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.344 |
2015-09-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.625 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7693 |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2015-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1681 |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07693 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5590