NY S05582 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain non-profit car-sharing organizations from the supplemental tax on passenger car rentals outside of the metropolitan commuter transportation district.
Title
Exempts certain non-profit car-sharing organizations from the supplemental tax on passenger car rentals outside of the metropolitan commuter transportation district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-13 | Senate | vetoed memo.200 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1391 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5582 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.454 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-09 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7574 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1391 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A07574 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - tabled