NY S05557 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-16 - signed chap.461
Status: Introduced on May 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-16 - signed chap.461
Summary
Removes limitations pertaining to emergency medical technicians or advanced emergency medical technicians NYC retirees earnings.
Title
Removes limitations pertaining to emergency medical technicians or advanced emergency medical technicians NYC retirees earnings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED BY A8371 | |
2009-06-01 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-27 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-26 | 1ST REPORT CAL.449 | |
2009-05-15 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08371 (Same As) 2009-09-16 - signed chap.461
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05557&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |