NY S05549 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires power authority of the state of New York to file a report annually commencing March 31, 2015 with the governor, the comptroller and the chairmen of the assembly ways and means and the senate finance committees, respectively, on its operations and transactions conforming, as far as feasible, with the uniform system of accounts required for electric corporations pursuant to the public service law.
Title
Requires power authority of the state of New York to file a report annually commencing March 31, 2015 with the governor, the comptroller and the chairmen of the assembly ways and means and the senate finance committees, respectively, on its operations and transactions conforming, as far as feasible, with the uniform system of accounts required for electric corporations pursuant to the public service law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1075 |
2011-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04250 (Same As) 2012-01-31 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS