NY S05546 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - PRINT NUMBER 5546A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - PRINT NUMBER 5546A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to general hospital and safety net hospital reimbursement rates and Medicaid adjustments.
Title
Relates to general hospital and safety net hospital reimbursement rates and Medicaid adjustments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5546A |
2020-01-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06677 (Same As) 2020-01-22 - reported referred to ways and means