NY S05537 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-19 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-19 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for quality assurance for trauma and emergency care.
Title
Provides for quality assurance for trauma and emergency care.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | Assembly | referred to health |
2014-05-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-04-28 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5537A |
2014-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.31 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2013-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |