NY S05501 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.506
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.506
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Ballston Spa Central School District to establish a semiconductor manufacturing tax stabilization reserve fund.
Title
Authorizes the Ballston Spa Central School District to establish a semiconductor manufacturing tax stabilization reserve fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Hugh Farley [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.506 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.476 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a7622b |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5501A |
2015-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1470 |
2015-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07622 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - substituted by s5501a