NY S05495 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6806
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6806
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the continuation of state health benefit plans for certain survivors of employees of the state and/or of a political subdivision or of a public authority.
Title
Provides for the continuation of state health benefit plans for certain survivors of employees of the state and/or of a political subdivision or of a public authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6806 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1675 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-04-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06806 (Same As) 2023-11-21 - signed chap.675