CA AB1872 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 519 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes: extortion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 519 | Amended Code | Citation Text |