NY S05475 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing family support centers for youth at risk of being, or alleged or adjudicated to be juvenile delinquents or persons in need of supervision; authorizes reimbursement to counties.
Title
Relates to establishing family support centers for youth at risk of being, or alleged or adjudicated to be juvenile delinquents or persons in need of supervision; authorizes reimbursement to counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07099 (Same As) 2018-04-10 - enacting clause stricken