NY S05470 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7082
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7082
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the moratorium on the issuance of certificates of environmental safety for the siting of facilities and certification of routes for the transportation of liquefied natural or petroleum gas.
Title
Extends the moratorium on the issuance of certificates of environmental safety for the siting of facilities and certification of routes for the transportation of liquefied natural or petroleum gas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7082 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1727 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07082 (Same As) 2017-08-21 - signed chap.188