NY S05465 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7834B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7834B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of housing preservation and development for the city of New York to bring a special proceeding for appointment of an administrator for distressed property; provides for owner liability for costs of operating property and costs of the administrator after the administrator takes over management of the property.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of housing preservation and development for the city of New York to bring a special proceeding for appointment of an administrator for distressed property; provides for owner liability for costs of operating property and costs of the administrator after the administrator takes over management of the property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7834B |
2013-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1654 |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5465A |
2013-06-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2013-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07834 (Same As) 2013-10-23 - signed chap.455