NY S05429 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the port authority of New York to conduct a study on the alignment of the Outerbridge Crossing in order to determine what steps would need to be taken in order to widen the bridge and increase traffic flow.
Title
Requires the port authority of New York to conduct a study on the alignment of the Outerbridge Crossing in order to determine what steps would need to be taken in order to widen the bridge and increase traffic flow.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5429A |
2019-05-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06994 (Same As) 2020-02-05 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS