NY S05414 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the obligation for motorists in certain counties to pay the metropolitan commuter transportation district supplemental registration fee.
Title
Eliminates the obligation for motorists in certain counties to pay the metropolitan commuter transportation district supplemental registration fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1836 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1725 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02626 (Same As) 2018-04-25 - enacting clause stricken