NY A02626 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the counties of Dutchess, Putnam, Rockland and Orange from the Metropolitan commuter transportation district supplemental driver's permit and license registration fees.
Title
Exempts the counties of Dutchess, Putnam, Rockland and Orange from the Metropolitan commuter transportation district supplemental driver's permit and license registration fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-01-20 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05414 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES