NY S05327 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - VETOED MEMO.139
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - VETOED MEMO.139
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a caregiver shall be eligible for assistance for child care under the child care block grant regardless of the hours the parent actually works.
Title
Provides that a caregiver shall be eligible for assistance for child care under the child care block grant regardless of the hours the parent actually works.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-22 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.139 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.503 |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a4986a |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1495 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5327A |
2023-05-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2023-03-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A04986 (Same As) 2023-06-10 - substituted by s5327a