NY A04986 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s5327a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s5327a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a caregiver shall be eligible for assistance for child care under the child care block grant regardless of the hours the parent actually works.
Title
Provides that a caregiver shall be eligible for assistance for child care under the child care block grant regardless of the hours the parent actually works.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s5327a |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.503 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.503 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-12 | Assembly | print number 4986a |
2023-05-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S05327 (Same As) 2023-12-22 - VETOED MEMO.139