NY S05321 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the maximum civil penalty from $500 to $1000 per day per property for each day the mortgagee or agent of the mortgagee has been in violation.
Title
Relates to increasing the maximum civil penalty from $500 to $1000 per day per property for each day the mortgagee or agent of the mortgagee has been in violation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2022-03-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.456 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2021-04-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.537 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09846 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - referred to judiciary