NY S05287 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the right to clean air and water and a healthful environment.
Title
Relates to the right to clean air and water and a healthful environment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-12 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-05-03 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-04-17 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2017-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06279 (Same As) 2018-04-24 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY