NY A06279 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the right to clean air and water and a healthful environment.
Title
Relates to the right to clean air and water and a healthful environment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Judiciary (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Judiciary (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.443 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.62 |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.62 |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | reported referred to judiciary |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05287 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY