NY S05280 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a certain agreement for a payment in lieu of taxes with respect to a lessee that is a qualified empire zone enterprise of certain real property.
Title
Relates to a certain agreement for a payment in lieu of taxes with respect to a lessee that is a qualified empire zone enterprise of certain real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7100 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1055 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07100 (Same As) 2017-09-12 - signed chap.296