NY S05272 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5272B
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5272B
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the ACT college entrance examination.
Title
Relates to the ACT college entrance examination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5272B |
2018-01-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2017-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5272A |
2017-05-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2017-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06526 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - amended on third reading 6526b