NY A06526 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - amended on third reading 6526b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - amended on third reading 6526b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the ACT college entrance examination.
Title
Relates to the ACT college entrance examination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6526b |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.462 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.539 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | print number 6526a |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05272 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5272B