NY S05270 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the standards of monthly need and home energy grant amounts for persons in receipt of public assistance.
Title
Relates to increasing the standards of monthly need and home energy grant amounts for persons in receipt of public assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-02-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5270A |
2024-02-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2023-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A05500 (Same As) 2024-03-01 - print number 5500a