NY S05234 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-22 - PRINT NUMBER 5234B
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-22 - PRINT NUMBER 5234B
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the Space Force as being members of the armed forces or veterans eligible for certain credits and benefits that are available to other active and veteran members of the armed forces.
Title
Includes the Space Force as being members of the armed forces or veterans eligible for certain credits and benefits that are available to other active and veteran members of the armed forces.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5234B |
2022-04-22 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2021-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5234A |
2021-05-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2021-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A07606 (Same As) 2022-02-16 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS