NY A07606 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the Space Force as being members of the armed forces or veterans eligible for certain credits and benefits that are available to other active and veteran members of the armed forces.
Title
Includes the Space Force as being members of the armed forces or veterans eligible for certain credits and benefits that are available to other active and veteran members of the armed forces.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7606a |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.260 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.384 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.384 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S05234 (Same As) 2022-04-22 - PRINT NUMBER 5234B