NY S05195 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to criminal justice faculty employed by a community college.
Title
Relates to criminal justice faculty employed by a community college.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-03-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.323 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5195A |
2016-02-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.698 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07009 (Same As) 2016-03-03 - print number 7009a