NY S05159 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the MTA to publish the proposed capital program plan on their website.
Title
Requires the MTA to publish the proposed capital program plan on their website.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1250 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1480 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01250 (Same As) 2017-12-13 - signed chap.452