NY A01250 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-13 - signed chap.452
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the MTA to publish the proposed capital program plan on their website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the MTA to publish the proposed capital program plan on their website.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-13Senatesigned chap.452
2017-12-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-13SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-13Senate3RD READING CAL.1480
2017-06-13SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5159
2017-03-06SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2017-03-06Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-03-06Assemblypassed assembly
2017-03-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.94
2017-03-01Assemblyreported
2017-01-11Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S05159 (Same As) 2017-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1250

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback