NY S05150 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends, from December 31, 2021 to December 31, 2022, the expiration of the authorization granted to residential property owners in high risk brush fire areas on Staten Island to cut and remove reeds from their property.
Title
Extends, from December 31, 2021 to December 31, 2022, the expiration of the authorization granted to residential property owners in high risk brush fire areas on Staten Island to cut and remove reeds from their property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2000 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.591 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02000 (Same As) 2021-06-11 - signed chap.115