NY A02000 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - signed chap.115
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - signed chap.115
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends, from December 31, 2021 to December 31, 2022, the expiration of the authorization granted to residential property owners in high risk brush fire areas on Staten Island to cut and remove reeds from their property.
Title
Extends, from December 31, 2021 to December 31, 2022, the expiration of the authorization granted to residential property owners in high risk brush fire areas on Staten Island to cut and remove reeds from their property.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. Charles Fall [D] | Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] | Asm. Michael Tannousis [R] |
Asm. Michael Reilly [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Assembly | signed chap.115 |
2021-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-04-27 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.591 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5150 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.98 |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05150 (Same As) 2021-04-27 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2000