NY S05132 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1346C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1346C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a motor vehicle dealer who receives a vehicle for resale and satisfies any security interest in such vehicle, but has not received a release of security interest for such vehicle, to apply to the commissioner of motor vehicles for a certificate of title free of liens upon submission of proof that the security interest in the vehicle has been satisfied.
Title
Authorizes a motor vehicle dealer who receives a vehicle for resale and satisfies any security interest in such vehicle, but has not received a release of security interest for such vehicle, to apply to the commissioner of motor vehicles for a certificate of title free of liens upon submission of proof that the security interest in the vehicle has been satisfied.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1346C |
2012-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5132D |
2012-06-14 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-14 | Senate | returned to senate |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2012-03-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2012-03-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-03-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-03-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-03-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-02-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.249 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1422 |
2011-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5132C |
2011-06-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2011-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5132B |
2011-06-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2011-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5132A |
2011-06-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01346 (Same As) 2012-12-17 - signed chap.493