NY A01346 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - signed chap.493
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes a motor vehicle dealer who receives a vehicle for resale and satisfies any security interest in such vehicle, but has not received a release of security interest for such vehicle, to apply to the commissioner of motor vehicles for a certificate of title free of liens upon submission of proof that the security interest in the vehicle has been satisfied.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes a motor vehicle dealer who receives a vehicle for resale and satisfies any security interest in such vehicle, but has not received a release of security interest for such vehicle, to apply to the commissioner of motor vehicles for a certificate of title free of liens upon submission of proof that the security interest in the vehicle has been satisfied.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-17Senatesigned chap.493
2012-12-05Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.249
2012-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5132D
2012-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.282
2012-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.282
2012-06-18Assemblyreported
2012-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-13Assemblyprint number 1346c
2012-06-13Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2012-03-20Assemblyreported referred to codes
2012-01-04Assemblyreferred to transportation
2011-06-14Assemblyprint number 1346b
2011-06-14Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2011-06-07Assemblyreported referred to codes
2011-05-25Assemblyprint number 1346a
2011-05-25Assemblyamend and recommit to transportation
2011-01-05Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S05132 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1346C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01346&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01346&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01346
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01346&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01346A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01346&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01346B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01346&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01346C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01346&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/A1346#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback