NY S05131 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-14 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-14 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits a retired member to change his or her option election or designate a new beneficiary where the beneficiary has been convicted of a family offense.
Title
Permits a retired member to change his or her option election or designate a new beneficiary where the beneficiary has been convicted of a family offense.
Sponsors
Sen. Lea Webb [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. Cordell Cleare [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] |
Sen. Nathalia Fernandez [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Robert Rolison [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2024-05-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.486 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2023-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1032 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-02-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05629 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental employees