NY S05095 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.280
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.280
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain property in Erie county from the prohibition of alcohol sales within a certain distance from a church.
Title
Exempts certain property in Erie county from the prohibition of alcohol sales within a certain distance from a church.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.280 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.955 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5095 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.542 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-04-11 | Senate | reference changed to economic development |
2019-04-10 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7131 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.955 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A07131 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.280