NY S05087 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of education to disregard a reduction in the apportionment of public money to the Clarkstown central school district.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of education to disregard a reduction in the apportionment of public money to the Clarkstown central school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.540 |
2013-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.641 |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a7226 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | referred to education |
2013-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1393 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07226 (Same As) 2013-06-21 - substituted by s5087