NY S05064 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.133
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.133
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes provisions permanent relating to hunting in the county of Genesee.
Title
Makes provisions permanent relating to hunting in the county of Genesee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.133 |
2017-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.223 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a6530a |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1553 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5064A |
2017-05-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06530 (Same As) 2017-06-14 - substituted by s5064a