NY S05046 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the operation of the donate life registry for organ, eye and tissue donation by a not-for-profit organization; requires all moneys in the life pass it on trust fund to be used for the operation and maintenance of such registry.
Title
Provides for the operation of the donate life registry for organ, eye and tissue donation by a not-for-profit organization; requires all moneys in the life pass it on trust fund to be used for the operation and maintenance of such registry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1492 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5046A |
2013-06-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2013-06-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07518 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to health