CA SB1048 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65103.5 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Planning and zoning: local planning: site plans.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1048 Jones (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3602.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3469.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and JUD. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65103.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |