NY S05017 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - signed chap.166
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - signed chap.166
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a bank or financial institution selling or transferring a mortgage during a modification process to provide the borrower with a written list of all documents relating to such application for modification that were provided to the bank or financial institution to which such mortgage was sold or transferred; and relates to the obligations of subsequent mortgage servicer shall assume all duties and obligations related to any previously approved first lien loan modification or other foreclosure prevention alternative.
Title
Requires a bank or financial institution selling or transferring a mortgage during a modification process to provide the borrower with a written list of all documents relating to such application for modification that were provided to the bank or financial institution to which such mortgage was sold or transferred; and relates to the obligations of subsequent mortgage servicer shall assume all duties and obligations related to any previously approved first lien loan modification or other foreclosure prevention alternative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | Senate | signed chap.166 |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1819 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5017A |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2019-05-29 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-29 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.365 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-07 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-04-16 | Senate | print number 92a |
2019-04-16 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to banks |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to banks |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A92A |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1819 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5017A |
2019-05-23 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2019-04-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A00092 (Same As) 2019-08-14 - signed chap.166