NY S05016 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-07 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-07 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to credit unions.
Title
Relates to credit unions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2013-05-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A07198 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to banks