NY S04980 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.477
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.477
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Sleepy Hollow to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to a certain police officer employed by such village.
Title
Authorizes the village of Sleepy Hollow to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to a certain police officer employed by such village.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.477 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | home rule request |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.437 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a5644a |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2016-05-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1047 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4980A |
2016-02-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2015-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2015-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1548 |
2015-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05644 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s4980a