NY A05644 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s4980a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s4980a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Sleepy Hollow to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to a certain police officer employed by such village.
Title
Authorizes the village of Sleepy Hollow to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to a certain police officer employed by such village.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted by s4980a |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.437 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-02-23 | Assembly | print number 5644a |
2016-02-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04980 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.477