NY S04924 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.296
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.296
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a conservation easement agreement in the town of Eden, county of Erie.
Title
Establishes a conservation easement agreement in the town of Eden, county of Erie.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.296 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.443 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7357a |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.312 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-29 | Senate | AMENDED 4924A |
2013-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.756 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07357 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s4924a