NY S04892 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on November 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.45
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on November 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.45
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Nourish New York program to facilitate programming that ensures that certain surplus agricultural products are provided to food relief organizations at competitive wholesale prices.
Title
Establishes the Nourish New York program to facilitate programming that ensures that certain surplus agricultural products are provided to food relief organizations at competitive wholesale prices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-20 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.45 |
2021-11-20 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.631 |
2021-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.125 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | substituted for a5781a |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2021-03-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | AMENDED 4892A |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.463 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-02-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A05781 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - substituted by s4892a