NY A05781 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-9)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - substituted by s4892a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - substituted by s4892a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Nourish New York program to facilitate programming that ensures that certain surplus agricultural products are provided to food relief organizations at competitive wholesale prices.
Title
Establishes the Nourish New York program to facilitate programming that ensures that certain surplus agricultural products are provided to food relief organizations at competitive wholesale prices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Assembly | substituted by s4892a |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.125 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | print number 5781a |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S04892 (Same As) 2021-11-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.45