NY S04887 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-4)
Status: Passed on August 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-16 - SIGNED CHAP.278
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-4)
Status: Passed on August 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-16 - SIGNED CHAP.278
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "roadway excavation quality assurance act"; relates to workers on excavations; provides that utility companies or their contractors shall use competent workers and shall pay the prevailing wage on projects where a permit to use, excavate, or open a street is required to be issued.
Title
Enacts the "roadway excavation quality assurance act"; relates to workers on excavations; provides that utility companies or their contractors shall use competent workers and shall pay the prevailing wage on projects where a permit to use, excavate, or open a street is required to be issued.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-16 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.278 |
2023-08-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.629 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a5608 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2023-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.653 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A05608 (Same As) 2023-06-07 - substituted by s4887