NY S04873 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the protection of pupils in educational settings from abuse and maltreatment; requires the fingerprinting of prospective school bus drivers.
Title
Relates to the protection of pupils in educational settings from abuse and maltreatment; requires the fingerprinting of prospective school bus drivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4873B |
2012-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-02-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.190 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | referred to education |
2011-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-01 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4873A |
2011-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.731 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |