NY S04841 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - PRINT NUMBER 4841C
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - PRINT NUMBER 4841C
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates from the class A misdemeanor of theft of services, the avoidance of payment for railroad, subway, bus or other public transportation services and allows for community service in lieu of a civil penalty for certain offenders of theft of transit services.
Title
Eliminates from the class A misdemeanor of theft of services, the avoidance of payment for railroad, subway, bus or other public transportation services and allows for community service in lieu of a civil penalty for certain offenders of theft of transit services.
Sponsors
Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4841C |
2018-02-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-07-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4841B |
2017-07-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2017-03-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4841A |
2017-03-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2017-03-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A09715 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - held for consideration in codes